Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 292 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18095 Week
» 71111 Month
» 190638 Year
» 3217491 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
865 |
m/e |
10/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9646 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
69646 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
A. Hill |
Class |
N7 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 10/1926 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 16/09/1962 |
Service Life |
35 yrs, 11 mths , 17 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1926 |
STR |
|
Stratford |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
16/09/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
16/09/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
10/1936 |
Condensers removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
22/08/1946 |
Liverpool Street Station |
On. 22/8 'N.7' 9646 became derailed at the end of Platforms 3/4 in the evening rush hour, and the breakdown train was in charge of 7160. |
SLS/194701 |
09/08/1958 |
Peterborough MPD |
C12 67398 has been working the Stamford branch with the N5s and C12 67363 has arrived as spare; however N7s 69635/46 have replaced N5s and more are expected as the N5s are withdrawn. |
SLS/195810 |
30/04/1961 |
Stratford Works (Old Works) |
New Erecting Shop: D204, D5041/3/72/95, D5515/6/62, D5625, D5907, D8216, D8403/8. Outside New Erecting Shop: D206, D5050/1, D5588, D5634, D5905. Old Works: 43105, 64697, 65460/2, 67716, 69646, 69730. Old Works Yard: 65465, 67701, 68538, 69713. Scrap Road: 68578, 69656, Works Shunters : DEPT32/44/5. |
SLS/196106 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1926 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 865 Built at Gorton Works |
|
|
10/1936 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9646 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69646 |
|
|
16/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69646 |
|
|