Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1318 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19121 Week
» 72137 Month
» 191664 Year
» 3218517 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
850 |
m/e |
07/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9642 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
69642 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
A. Hill |
Class |
N7 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 07/1926 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 24/11/1960 |
Service Life |
34 yrs, 4 mths , 25 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
31C |
Kings Lynn |
w/e |
08/10/1950 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
on |
29/10/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
24/11/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1937 |
Condensers removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1926 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 850 Built at Gorton Works |
|
|
04/1937 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9642 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69642 |
|
|
08/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
21/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
29/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
25/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
24/11/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69642 |
|
|