|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
09/08/1958 | Peterborough MPD | C12 67398 has been working the Stamford branch with the N5s and C12 67363 has arrived as spare; however N7s 69635/46 have replaced N5s and more are expected as the N5s are withdrawn. | SLS/195810 |
02/04/1959 | Stratford Works (Waiting cut up) | Old Works, 43143 (40F), 61009 (40A), 61116 (14D), 61202 (40A), 61232 (30F), 61329 (30A), 61348 (31F), 61371 (31A), 61405 (40A), 64823 (40F), 69696 (30A). Diesel Sp., D206 (34B), 11138 (30F), 12078 (1A), 15203 (75C), D2550 (32B), D3094 (75A), D3301 (30A), D5304 (34B), D8404 (30A). Waiting Wks., 61575 (31A), 64650 (30E), 64677 (30A), 64715 (40E), 65556 (31A), 69637 (34C), 69669 (30A). Paint shop, 15215 (75C), 61375 (30A), Stripping Sp., 43105 (30A), 61573 Wdn, 69728 (30A). Foundry, 68541. Waiting cut up, 61566/76/80, 62536/82/8, 64651, 65467, 65574, 68574/638, 69600/10/6/9/23/7/34/5/59/66/76/716/31. | SLS/195905 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1926 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 829 Built at Gorton Works |
||
07/1937 | Modification | Modification: Condensers removed | ||
08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9635 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) | ||
03/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 69635 | ||
16/04/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) | ||
09/08/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
23/08/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
19/12/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hatfield (34C) | ||
09/03/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69635 |