Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 983 Today
» 1125 Yesterday
» 4349 Week
» 983 Month
» 337829 Year
» 1559394 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 7999 y/e 1924
Great Eastern Railway 999E m/e 03/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9621 m/e 01/1947
British Railways 69621 m/e 01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N703/1924
N7/402/1946
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number K89
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 03/1924
Withdrawal Tue 11/09/1962
Service Life 38 yrs, 6 mths , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1924
STR Stratford on 01/01/1948
30A Stratford 5w/e 22/09/1951
38A Colwick 4w/e 19/07/1952
38E Woodford Halse 4w/e 14/02/1953
38A Colwick 4w/e 20/06/1953
30A Stratford 5w/e 24/04/1954
32C Lowestoft 4w/e 16/03/1957
30A Stratford w/e 05/09/1959
   Withdrawn on 11/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC PKS Parkeston Quay 4w/e 25/12/1948
ALLOC 30A Stratford w/e 25/08/1951
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 38E Woodford Halse 4w/e 21/02/1953
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 24/04/1954
ALLOC 32C Lowestoft 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 05/09/1959
WDN   on 11/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1937 Condensers removed

Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7999    
03/1924 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 999
Built at Stratford Works
   
05/1937 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
01/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 9621    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69621    
22/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
19/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
14/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E)    
20/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
24/04/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
16/03/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C)    
05/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
11/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 69621    

prev prev