Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 3667 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17073 Week
» 70089 Month
» 189616 Year
» 3216469 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7998 |
y/e |
1924 |
Great Eastern Railway |
998E |
m/e |
02/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9620 |
m/e |
01/1947 |
British Railways |
69620 |
m/e |
07/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
A. Hill |
Class |
N7 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
K89 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 02/1924 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 24/11/1960 |
Service Life |
36 yrs, 9 mths , 24 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
09/1937 |
Condensers removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
12/08/1957 |
Bury St. Edmunds |
No transfers are now being recorded between Cambridge (31A) and Bury (31E). Its sub-depot, Sudbury, is supplied by 31A. The present allocation of Bury is 61546/53/4/67/73/6, 62543, 65391, 68497, 69616/20. |
SLS/195709 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7998 |
|
|
02/1924 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 998 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
09/1937 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
01/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9620 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
25/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) |
|
|
07/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69620 |
|
|
10/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (STR) |
|
|
05/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
24/04/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
16/02/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
07/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
24/11/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69620 |
|
|