Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 992 Today
» 1125 Yesterday
» 4358 Week
» 992 Month
» 337838 Year
» 1559403 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 7997 y/e 1924
Great Eastern Railway 997E m/e 02/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9619 m/e 11/1946
British Railways 69619 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N702/1924
N7/402/1942
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number K89
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 02/1924
Withdrawal Mon 16/02/1959
Service Life 35 yrs , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1924
STR Stratford on 01/01/1948
30E Colchester 5w/e 17/12/1955
30A Stratford 5w/e 24/03/1956
31A Cambridge 4w/e 16/02/1957
31C Kings Lynn 5w/e 14/06/1958
30A Stratford w/e 06/12/1958
   Withdrawn on 16/02/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC PKS Parkeston Quay 4w/e 25/12/1948
ALLOC STR Stratford w/e 16/04/1949
ALLOC 30E Colchester 4w/e 03/12/1955
ALLOC 30A Stratford 5w/e 31/03/1956
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 23/02/1957
ALLOC 31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 27/12/1958
WDN   on 16/02/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1936 Condensers removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7997    
02/1924 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 997
Built at Stratford Works
   
05/1936 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9619    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69619    
17/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
24/03/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
16/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
06/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
16/02/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 69619    

prev prev