Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 146 Today
» 1086 Yesterday
» 6453 Week
» 21567 Month
» 324757 Year
» 1546322 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 7996 y/e 1924
Great Eastern Railway 996E m/e 01/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9618 m/e 06/1946
British Railways 69618 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N701/1924
N7/407/1948
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number K89
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 01/1924
Withdrawal Sun 10/09/1961
Service Life 37 yrs, 8 mths , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 01/1924
STR Stratford on 01/01/1948
34B Hornsey 5w/e 17/12/1955
34C Hatfield w/e 07/02/1959
34A Kings Cross w/e 07/01/1961
30A Stratford w/e 22/04/1961
   Withdrawn on 10/09/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 34B Hornsey 4w/e 03/12/1955
ALLOC 34C Hatfield 4w/e 21/02/1959
ALLOC 34A Kings Cross 5w/e 04/02/1961
ALLOC 30A Stratford 5w/e 13/05/1961
WDN   on 10/09/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1937 Condensers removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7996    
01/1924 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 996
Built at Stratford Works
   
05/1937 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9618    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69618    
17/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Hornsey (34B)    
07/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Hatfield (34C)    
07/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
22/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
10/09/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 69618    

prev prev