Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1072 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14478 Week
» 67494 Month
» 187021 Year
» 3213874 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7995 |
y/e |
1924 |
Great Eastern Railway |
995E |
m/e |
01/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9617 |
m/e |
01/1947 |
British Railways |
69617 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
A. Hill |
Class |
N7 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
K89 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 01/1924 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 04/07/1960 |
Service Life |
36 yrs, 6 mths , 3 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
34C |
Hatfield |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
28/11/1953 |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
4w/e |
23/02/1957 |
ALLOC |
31C |
Kings Lynn |
4w/e |
28/03/1958 |
ALLOC |
30E |
Colchester |
4w/e |
27/12/1958 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
26/12/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
04/07/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/1937 |
Condensers removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7995 |
|
|
01/1924 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 995 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
07/1937 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
01/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9617 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69617 |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hatfield (34C) |
|
|
15/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hatfield (34C) |
|
|
19/12/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
16/02/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
08/03/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
06/12/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
20/12/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
12/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
04/07/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69617 |
|
|