Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 991 Today
» 1125 Yesterday
» 4357 Week
» 991 Month
» 337837 Year
» 1559402 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 7994 y/e 1924
Great Eastern Railway 994E m/e 01/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9616 m/e 12/1946
British Railways 69616 m/e 09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N701/1924
N7/402/1942
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number K89
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 01/1924
Withdrawal Thu 01/01/1959
Service Life 35 yrs , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 01/1924
STR Stratford on 01/01/1948
31A Cambridge 4w/e 16/02/1957
   Withdrawn on 01/01/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 23/02/1957
WDN   on 01/01/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1937 Condensers removed


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/08/1957 Bury St. Edmunds No transfers are now being recorded between Cambridge (31A) and Bury (31E). Its sub-depot, Sudbury, is supplied by 31A. The present allocation of Bury is 61546/53/4/67/73/6, 62543, 65391, 68497, 69616/20. SLS/195709
31/12/1958 Stratford Works (Waiting Wks.) Old Works-61003 (30F), 43107 (31D), 61066 (31A), 61089 (30A), 61136 (14D), 61160 (32B), 61164 (30A), 61254 (32B), 61299 (40E), 61361 (30E), 61372 (30A), 61632 (31A), 64677 (30A), 64965 (33A), 65561 (32B), 69695-Wdn., 80079 (33B). Diesel Shop-12064 (14A), 15214 (75C), D208 (34B), D2208 (30A), D2210 (32A), D2214 (32A), D3221 (75C), D3444 (34A), D3460 (73C), D3476 (34C), D5514 (30A), D8407 (30A). Waiting Wks.-61336 (30E), 61573 (31E), 61576 (31E), 62571 (40A), 62582 (31A), 62610 (31C), 64651 (30E), 64672 (31B), 64688 (31A), 68625 (32D), 68630 (30A), 68636 (30A), 69610 (30A), 69616 (31A), 69703 (30A), 69717 (30A), Departmental 36. Stripping-62614, 69608/41. Foundry-65568, 65587, 69624. On Shed Ex Wks.-D2573 (32G), D3217 (75A). Waiting Cut Up-61547/61/4, 62518/34/6/43/5/66/72/88/615, 62788, 64645, 65390/438/41/4, 65504/74, 68529/41/616/8/32, 68653/7/9/62/6, 69628. SLS/195902

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7994    
01/1924 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 994
Built at Stratford Works
   
11/1937 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9616    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69616    
16/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
01/01/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 69616    

prev prev