Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 908 Today
» 1125 Yesterday
» 4274 Week
» 908 Month
» 337754 Year
» 1559319 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Eastern Railway 992E m/e 12/1923
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 7992 y/e 1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9614 m/e 06/1946
British Railways 69614 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N712/1923
N7/402/1940
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number K89
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 12/1923
Withdrawal Sun 04/12/1960
Service Life 37 yrs , 4 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1923
STR Stratford on 01/01/1948
30A Stratford 5w/e 22/09/1951
   Withdrawn on 04/12/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC PKS Parkeston Quay w/e 16/04/1949
ALLOC 30A Stratford w/e 25/08/1951
WDN   on 04/12/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1936 Condensers removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1923 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 992
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7992    
05/1936 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9614    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69614    
22/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
04/12/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 69614    

prev prev