Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 489 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19400 Week
» 84354 Month
» 287018 Year
» 3313871 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
991E |
m/e |
12/1923 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7991 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9613 |
m/e |
01/1947 |
British Railways |
69613 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
A. Hill |
Class |
N7 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
K89 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 12/1923 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 09/11/1959 |
Service Life |
35 yrs, 11 mths , 10 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/1936 |
Condensers removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1923 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 991 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7991 |
|
|
07/1936 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
01/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9613 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69613 |
|
|
03/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hatfield (HAT) |
|
|
05/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
10/11/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hatfield (34C) |
|
|
19/12/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
19/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) |
|
|
09/11/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69613 |
|
|