Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 929 Today
» 1125 Yesterday
» 4295 Week
» 929 Month
» 337775 Year
» 1559340 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Eastern Railway 991E m/e 12/1923
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 7991 y/e 1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9613 m/e 01/1947
British Railways 69613 m/e 10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N712/1923
N7/412/1941
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number K89
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 12/1923
Withdrawal Mon 09/11/1959
Service Life 35 yrs, 11 mths , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1923
STR Stratford on 01/01/1948
38A Colwick 4w/e 19/05/1951
30A Stratford 4w/e 19/12/1953
30E Colchester 4w/e 19/10/1957
30F Parkeston Quay w/e 07/11/1959
   Withdrawn on 09/11/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HAT Hatfield w/e 03/12/1949
ALLOC 38A Colwick w/e 05/05/1951
ALLOC 34C Hatfield w/e 10/11/1951
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 28/11/1953
ALLOC 30E Colchester 4w/e 05/10/1957
WDN   on 09/11/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1936 Condensers removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1923 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 991
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7991    
07/1936 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
01/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 9613    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69613    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
19/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
19/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F)    
09/11/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 69613    

prev prev