Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 859 Today
» 1125 Yesterday
» 4225 Week
» 859 Month
» 337705 Year
» 1559270 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Eastern Railway 990E m/e 12/1923
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 7990 y/e 1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9612 m/e 01/1947
British Railways 69612 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N712/1923
N7/401/1944
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number K89
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 12/1923
Withdrawal Mon 03/08/1959
Service Life 35 yrs, 8 mths , 4 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1923
STR Stratford on 01/01/1948
30A Stratford 5w/e 23/08/1952
34B Hornsey 3w/e 16/06/1956
30E Colchester 5w/e 20/07/1957
   Withdrawn on 03/08/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC PKS Parkeston Quay 4w/e 25/12/1948
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 09/08/1952
ALLOC 34B Hornsey 4w/e 23/06/1956
ALLOC 30E Colchester 4w/e 13/07/1957
WDN   on 03/08/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1936 Condensers removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1923 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 990
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7990    
07/1936 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
01/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 9612    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69612    
23/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Hornsey (34B)    
20/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
03/08/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 69612    

prev prev