Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 138 Today
» 1086 Yesterday
» 6445 Week
» 21559 Month
» 324749 Year
» 1546314 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Eastern Railway 1010 m/e 11/1921
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 8010 y/e 1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1944) 7988 m/e 09/1944
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9610 m/e 12/1946
British Railways 69610 m/e 08/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N711/1921
N7/410/1943
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number K85
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
To Service During 11/1921
Withdrawal Thu 01/01/1959
Service Life 37 yrs, 2 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1921
STR Stratford on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn on 01/01/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 01/01/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1937 Condensers removed


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1948 Darlington Works Locomotives awaiting Works during December included:-Nos. 952, 1437, 1625/41, 2378, 2970 (the last 'C.7'), 3368, 5639, 5650 (badly damaged at Jervaulx), 5693, 5759/97, 5807, 7278, 7651, 8010/37, 8155, 8292, 9792, 9892, 60510, 62732/33, 65056, 67704/05/10/19/23, 69910/33, 'Austerity' 70877, 77414/69. Locomotives ex Works during December included:-Nos. 60918/42/70, 61432, 61601/29/30/51, 62344/65, 62728/31/54, 63352, 63423, 65033, 65856, 67283, 67342, 67636/39/87, 67701, 68016 (altered bunker), 68264/75, 68436, 68696, 68745, 69102, 69794, 69842/79/89, 'Austerity' 77329. Locomotives broken up: Nos. 2390 an 3327. The two Class 'V.2's' which have hitherto been used as main line pilots, have now been replaced by Class 'A.3' Nos. 70 an 76. SLS/194902
31/12/1958 Stratford Works (Waiting Wks.) Old Works-61003 (30F), 43107 (31D), 61066 (31A), 61089 (30A), 61136 (14D), 61160 (32B), 61164 (30A), 61254 (32B), 61299 (40E), 61361 (30E), 61372 (30A), 61632 (31A), 64677 (30A), 64965 (33A), 65561 (32B), 69695-Wdn., 80079 (33B). Diesel Shop-12064 (14A), 15214 (75C), D208 (34B), D2208 (30A), D2210 (32A), D2214 (32A), D3221 (75C), D3444 (34A), D3460 (73C), D3476 (34C), D5514 (30A), D8407 (30A). Waiting Wks.-61336 (30E), 61573 (31E), 61576 (31E), 62571 (40A), 62582 (31A), 62610 (31C), 64651 (30E), 64672 (31B), 64688 (31A), 68625 (32D), 68630 (30A), 68636 (30A), 69610 (30A), 69616 (31A), 69703 (30A), 69717 (30A), Departmental 36. Stripping-62614, 69608/41. Foundry-65568, 65587, 69624. On Shed Ex Wks.-D2573 (32G), D3217 (75A). Waiting Cut Up-61547/61/4, 62518/34/6/43/5/66/72/88/615, 62788, 64645, 65390/438/41/4, 65504/74, 68529/41/616/8/32, 68653/7/9/62/6, 69628. SLS/195902

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1921 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1010
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8010    
02/1937 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
09/1944 Renumbered Renumbered to 7988    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9610    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
08/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 69610    
01/01/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 69610    

prev prev