Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 28 Online
» 872 Today
» 1125 Yesterday
» 4238 Week
» 872 Month
» 337718 Year
» 1559283 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Eastern Railway 1006 m/e 09/1921
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 8006 y/e 1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1944) 7984 m/e 08/1944
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9606 m/e 08/1946
British Railways 69606 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N709/1921
N7/403/1942
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number K85
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
To Service During 09/1921
Withdrawal Mon 11/08/1958
Service Life 36 yrs, 11 mths , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1921
STR Stratford on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn on 11/08/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GOR Gorton w/e 26/06/1948
ALLOC BID Bidston w/e 05/02/1949
WDN   on 11/08/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1936 Condensers removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1921 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1006
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8006    
12/1936 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
08/1944 Renumbered Renumbered to 7984    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9606    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69606    
11/08/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 69606    

prev prev