Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 910 Today
» 1125 Yesterday
» 4276 Week
» 910 Month
» 337756 Year
» 1559321 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Eastern Railway 1001 m/e 02/1915
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 8001 y/e 1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1944) 7979 m/e 08/1944
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9601 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 69601 m/e 10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N702/1915
N7/411/1944
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number L77
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
To Service During 02/1915
Withdrawal Mon 05/05/1958
Service Life 43 yrs, 3 mths , 4 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1915
STR Stratford on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn on 05/05/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC MAR March m/e 31/01/1946
WDN   on 05/05/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1936 Condensers removed


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1952 Locomotives still carrying old numbers (LNER) Engines running with L.N.E. Numbers. (March 1952) 1423, 1879, 2364, 2372, 2395, 2620, 2654, 2659, 3573, 3585, 3647, 3913, 4114, 4117, 4140, 4368, 4642, 5177, 5213, 5297, 5331, 5343, 5565, 7461, 7465, 7470, 7471, 7488, 7500, 7604, 7606, 7625, 8000/1, 8091/6, 8103/8/9/10/21/24/30/31/34-38, 8142/3/5/9, 8154/7, 8161/8, 8173/6/7/8, 8249, 8298, 8316, 8343/54, 8405/94, 8504/14/25/68, 8619/64, 8788/95, 8915/74/79, 9143, 9271/73, 9322, 9707. Uncertain: 851, 6480/1, 9290, 9920 (? done and not reported). SLS/195206

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1915 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1001
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8001    
10/1936 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
08/1944 Renumbered Renumbered to 7979    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9601    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69601    
05/05/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 69601    

prev prev