Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 358 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6142 Week
» 27531 Month
» 147058 Year
» 3173911 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
946 |
m/e |
03/1901 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5946 |
m/e |
06/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9370 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
69370 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Works Number |
4253 |
To Service |
During 03/1901 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 10/09/1960 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 6 mths , 12 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1931 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1901 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 946 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4253 |
|
|
06/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5946 |
|
|
12/1931 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9370 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69370 |
|
|
10/05/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
19/07/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barnsley (41G) |
|
|
09/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) |
|
|
10/09/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69370 |
|
|