Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 336 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6120 Week
» 27509 Month
» 147036 Year
» 3173889 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
945 |
m/e |
03/1901 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5945 |
m/e |
12/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9369 |
m/e |
01/1947 |
British Railways |
69369 |
w/e |
30/12/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Works Number |
4252 |
To Service |
During 03/1901 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 02/02/1957 |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 11 mths , 4 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
39B |
Sheffield Darnall |
4w/e |
01/01/1955 |
ALLOC |
40F |
Boston |
4w/e |
05/11/1955 |
ALLOC |
40B |
Immingham |
5w/e |
31/03/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
02/02/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
10/1931 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
14/12/1954 |
York MPD |
Fort William shed is not often represented at York, but on 14/12/54 62031 (K1-63D) was at York shed after a visit to Doncaster Works. 67745 (L1-34D) was at York on 15/12/54 after a visit to Darlington, and 67780 (L1-34E) in similar circumstances on 31/12/54. On 20/12/54 new BR Standard 2-6-4T 80113. from Doncaster Works was at York, en route for the Scottish Region, and fitted with tablet exchange apparatus. On the same date a surprising arrival at York was 69369 (N5-34E), en route for Darlington Works for repair owing to an alleged surplus of repair work at Gorton with a corresponding shortage at Darlington. 69369 was apparently overcome by its long journey, as a hot bearing developed necessitating attention at York shed; it reappeared in York shed yard on 30/12/54. 63755 (O1-54B), fitted with additional pumps for the Tyne Dock-Consett working, was also at York on the same date. On 28/12/54 46469 (30E) was at York after a visit to Darlington Works. 44669 (68A) worked the Holbeck duty on the 9.22 a.m. Leeds City-Scarborough, etc., on 28/12/54, and the same duty was taken on 30/12/54 by 44792 (68A). 73066 (20A) has continued appearances on this turn, while 73065 (19B) has also visited York on Millhouses turns, particularly the 10.20 a.m. Bristol-Newcastle. On 29/12/54 the 3.55 p.m. relief arrival at York from Birmingham (New Street) was worked by 42756 (17B). On 31/12/54 new BR Standard 2-6-2T 82029 was at York on arrival in the North Eastern Region from Swindon. Ex-Works engines on shed or this date also included 61215, (B1-53B), 67780 (L1-34E), and 90382 (AY-53A). |
SLS/195501 |
14/12/1954 |
York MPD |
Fort William shed is not often represented at York, but on 14/12/54 62031 (K1-63D) was at York shed after a visit to Doncaster Works. 67745 (L1-34D) was at York on 15/12/54 after a visit to Darlington, and 67780 (L1-34E) in similar circumstances on 31/12/54. On 20/12/54 new BR Standard 2-6-4T 80113. from Doncaster Works was at York, en route for the Scottish Region, and fitted with tablet exchange apparatus. On the same date a surprising arrival at York was 69369 (N5-34E), en route for Darlington Works for repair owing to an alleged surplus of repair work at Gorton with a corresponding shortage at Darlington. 69369 was apparently overcome by its long journey, as a hot bearing developed necessitating attention at York shed; it reappeared in York shed yard on 30/12/54. 63755 (O1-54B), fitted with additional pumps for the Tyne Dock-Consett working, was also at York on the same date. On 28/12/54 46469 (30E) was at York after a visit to Darlington Works. 44669 (68A) worked the Holbeck duty on the 9.22 a.m. Leeds City-Scarborough, etc., on 28/12/54, and the same duty was taken on 30/12/54 by 44792 (68A). 73066 (20A) has continued appearances on this turn, while 73065 (19B) has also visited York on Millhouses turns, particularly the 10.20 a.m. Bristol-Newcastle. On 29/12/54 the 3.55 p.m. relief arrival at York from Birmingham (New Street) was worked by 42756 (17B). On 31/12/54 new BR Standard 2-6-2T 82029 was at York on arrival in the North Eastern Region from Swindon. Ex-Works engines on shed or this date also included 61215, (B1-53B), 67780 (L1-34E), and 90382 (AY-53A). |
SLS/195501 |
29/01/1955 |
York MPD |
69369 (34E) mentioned in last month's notes, duly proceeded to Darlington (Bank Top), but was not accepted into North Road works. After returning to York, it spent a considerable time under repair in York shed before proceeding to Darnall (39B) on transfer. 'J25' 65650 an 65654 are now in store at York together with 62345. On 15th January, a Sheffield to Middlesbrough football excursion (M886) was worked throughout by 44855 (19A), which took water in York station platforms. On the same date 61028 (38C) was at York en route for Darlington works for repair. Other GC Section 'Bls' for Darlington works recently have included 61141 (38C), 61152 (39B) and 61328 (40B). 'Patriot' 45510 (5A) was an unusual visitor at York on 17th January. On 21st January, the 9.22 a.m. Leeds (City) to Scarborough was worked by 'B16/1' 61445 (50B) instead of the usual Holbeck Class 5, but 44853 (20A) worked the 3.10 p.m. York to Leeds (City). |
SLS/195503 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1901 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 945 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4252 |
|
|
12/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5945 |
|
|
10/1931 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
01/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9369 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Neasden (NEA) |
|
|
30/12/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69369 |
|
|
25/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B) |
|
|
12/11/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Boston (40F) |
|
|
24/03/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
02/02/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69369 |
|
|