Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1068 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14474 Week
» 67490 Month
» 187017 Year
» 3213870 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
936 |
m/e |
06/1900 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5936 |
m/e |
11/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9360 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
69360 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Works Number |
4196 |
To Service |
During 06/1900 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 19/03/1960 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 9 mths , 17 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
CLK |
Colwick |
w/e |
17/04/1948 |
ALLOC |
WFD |
Woodford Halse |
w/e |
25/06/1949 |
ALLOC |
38A |
Colwick |
4w/e |
28/11/1953 |
LOAN |
9H |
Gorton |
on |
01/02/1958 |
ALLOC |
9H |
Gorton |
on |
23/02/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
19/03/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1933 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 936 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4196 |
|
|
11/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5936 |
|
|
03/1933 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9360 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Staveley (G.C.) (STV) |
|
|
17/04/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69360 |
|
|
25/06/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) |
|
|
07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) |
|
|
21/11/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
17/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (39A) |
|
|
19/03/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69360 |
|
|