Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 345 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18148 Week
» 71164 Month
» 190691 Year
» 3217544 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
933 |
m/e |
05/1900 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5933 |
m/e |
09/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9357 |
m/e |
03/1946 |
British Railways |
69357 |
m/e |
01/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Works Number |
4193 |
To Service |
During 05/1900 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 11/11/1955 |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 6 mths , 12 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1900 |
BRN |
|
Barnsley |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
36B |
|
Mexborough |
4w/e |
20/03/1954 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
11/11/1955 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
36B |
Mexborough |
5w/e |
27/03/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
11/11/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1930 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
11/10/1955 |
York |
An unusual visitor to York in October was 73051 (71G) which worked the 4.15 p.m. stopping passenger train from York to Sheffield (Midland) on 11/10/55. (This is normally a Saltley or Bournville Stanier Class 5 turn.) On 19/10/55 ex-works (Darlington) B1s at York shed were 61110 (37A) and 61229 (37C). On 7/11/55 42860 (26B) worked the 10.10 a.m. York to Manchester (Victoria) and 5.10 p.m. Manchester (Victoria) to York instead of the usual York B1. N5 No. 69357 (36B) was in York shed on 9/11/55, and on 15/11/55 A7 No. 69785 (53C) was in the shed yard en route for Darlington works. On 17/11/55 York had quite a Great Central appearance with 69275 (40A) in the shed and 69256 (40F), 69278 (36D), 69303 (36D), and 69310 (38A) in the shed yard, all in steam, and some marked in chalk 'For Darlington plant'. Another most unusual visitor, both as regards type and shed, on the same day was 7F 0-8-0 49648 (25E). |
SLS/195512 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 933 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4193 |
|
|
09/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5933 |
|
|
08/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9357 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Barnsley (BRN) |
|
|
01/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69357 |
|
|
20/03/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) |
|
|
11/11/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69357 |
|
|