Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1615 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7399 Week
» 28788 Month
» 148315 Year
» 3175168 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
932 |
m/e |
05/1900 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5932 |
m/e |
04/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9356 |
on |
17/03/1946 |
British Railways |
69356 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Works Number |
4192 |
To Service |
During 05/1900 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 23/02/1957 |
Service Life |
56 yrs, 9 mths , 24 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1900 |
WAL |
|
Walton on the Hill |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
23/02/1957 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
WAT |
|
m/e |
31/01/1946 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
23/02/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
09/1932 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 932 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4192 |
|
|
04/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5932 |
|
|
09/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
17/03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9356 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Walton on the Hill (WAL) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69356 |
|
|
23/02/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69356 |
|
|