Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 255 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6039 Week
» 27428 Month
» 146955 Year
» 3173808 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
925 |
m/e |
04/1900 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5925 |
m/e |
03/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9349 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
69349 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Works Number |
4185 |
To Service |
During 04/1900 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 31/08/1958 |
Service Life |
58 yrs , 5 mths |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
04/1900 |
NTH |
|
Northwich |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
WRK |
|
|
w/e |
07/02/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
31/08/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
NTH |
Northwich |
m/e |
31/01/1946 |
ALLOC |
WRK |
|
w/e |
07/02/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/08/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
09/1931 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 925 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4185 |
|
|
03/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5925 |
|
|
09/1931 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9349 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Northwich (NTH) |
|
|
07/02/1948 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69349 |
|
|
31/08/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69349 |
|
|