|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1950 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during January: These included Nos. 60152, 61072, 61117/18, 61307, 1751, 61764, 1780, 61784, 2474/76/88, 2684/94, 62733, 3058, 3168, 64575, 4586, 64621/28/36, 4786, 64877/80, 4919/40, 65923, 5924, 65932, 7453/80, 68100, 8323/44, 9170, 9214, 9507, 69595, 90505, ex-W.D. 77089, 77231, 73792. | SLS/195003 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1900 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 924 Built at Gorton Works |
||
08/1925 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 5924 | ||
08/1930 | Modification | Modification: Converted to N5/2 | ||
10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9348 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Barnsley (BRN) | ||
08/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 69348 | ||
24/07/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
23/10/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B) | ||
25/01/1957 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69348 |