Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 350 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6134 Week
» 27523 Month
» 147050 Year
» 3173903 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
923 |
m/e |
12/1900 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5923 |
m/e |
08/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9347 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
69347 |
m/e |
02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
To Service |
During 12/1900 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 14/12/1957 |
Service Life |
57 yrs , 14 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
9C |
Macclesfield |
w/e |
19/08/1950 |
ALLOC |
NINEELMS |
Nine Elms |
w/e |
26/08/1950 |
ALLOC |
NINEELMS |
Nine Elms |
w/e |
24/09/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
12/10/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1928 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 923 Built at Gorton Works |
|
|
08/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5923 |
|
|
03/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9347 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Gorton (GOR) |
|
|
02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69347 |
|
|
26/08/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
09/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Macclesfield (9C) |
|
|
24/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
14/12/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69347 |
|
|