Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1409 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7193 Week
» 28582 Month
» 148109 Year
» 3174962 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
919 |
m/e |
09/1900 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5919 |
m/e |
10/1927 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9343 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
69343 |
m/e |
02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
To Service |
During 09/1900 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 11/01/1960 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 4 mths , 11 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1932 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 919 Built at Gorton Works |
|
|
10/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5919 |
|
|
03/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9343 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) |
|
|
02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69343 |
|
|
05/11/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wrexham Rhosddu (6E) |
|
|
01/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
10/05/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
19/07/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barnsley (41G) |
|
|
09/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) |
|
|
11/01/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69343 |
|
|