Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 966 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6750 Week
» 28139 Month
» 147666 Year
» 3174519 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
918 |
m/e |
07/1900 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5918 |
m/e |
06/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9342 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
69342 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
To Service |
During 07/1900 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 06/08/1959 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 1 mth , 7 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1928 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 918 Built at Gorton Works |
|
|
06/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5918 |
|
|
06/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9342 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Brunswick (LIV) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69342 |
|
|
04/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester Northgate (6D) |
|
|
10/05/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
19/07/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barnsley (41G) |
|
|
06/08/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69342 |
|
|