Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3847 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17253 Week
» 70269 Month
» 189796 Year
» 3216649 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
913 |
m/e |
03/1900 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5913 |
m/e |
01/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9337 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
69337 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
To Service |
During 03/1900 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 06/08/1956 |
Service Life |
56 yrs, 5 mths , 8 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
02/1933 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 913 Built at Gorton Works |
|
|
01/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5913 |
|
|
02/1933 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9337 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Brunswick (LIV) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69337 |
|
|
20/08/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
17/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) |
|
|
23/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) |
|
|
16/05/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (37C) |
|
|
20/06/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) |
|
|
25/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B) |
|
|
06/08/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69337 |
|
|