Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 2839 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16245 Week
» 69261 Month
» 188788 Year
» 3215641 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
911 |
m/e |
02/1900 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5911 |
m/e |
08/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9335 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
69335 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
To Service |
During 02/1900 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 14/09/1957 |
Service Life |
57 yrs, 7 mths , 14 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1932 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 911 Built at Gorton Works |
|
|
08/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5911 |
|
|
11/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9335 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Northwich (NTH) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69335 |
|
|
27/12/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
03/01/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
21/05/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wrexham Rhosddu (6E) |
|
|
14/09/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69335 |
|
|