Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1635 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7419 Week
» 28808 Month
» 148335 Year
» 3175188 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
908 |
m/e |
12/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5908 |
m/e |
02/1927 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9332 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
69332 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
To Service |
During 12/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 11/02/1959 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 2 mths , 12 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1932 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 908 Built at Gorton Works |
|
|
02/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5908 |
|
|
08/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northwich (NTH) |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9332 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Heaton Mersey (STP) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69332 |
|
|
18/04/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester Northgate (6D) |
|
|
10/05/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
19/07/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barnsley (41G) |
|
|
11/02/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69332 |
|
|