Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 350 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6134 Week
» 27523 Month
» 147050 Year
» 3173903 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
904 |
m/e |
10/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5904 |
m/e |
03/1927 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9328 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
69328 |
m/e |
02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
To Service |
During 10/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 09/01/1957 |
Service Life |
57 yrs, 3 mths , 10 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
91E |
To Eastern Region |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
EXLOAN |
39A |
Gorton |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
09/01/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1932 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 904 Built at Gorton Works |
|
|
03/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5904 |
|
|
12/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
12/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northwich (NTH) |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9328 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Heaton Mersey (STP) |
|
|
02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69328 |
|
|
18/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (39A) |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E) |
|
|
09/01/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69328 |
|
|