Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1402 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7186 Week
» 28575 Month
» 148102 Year
» 3174955 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
902 |
m/e |
09/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5902 |
m/e |
02/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9326 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
69326 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
To Service |
During 09/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 14/12/1957 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 3 mths , 13 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1933 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
22/03/1948 |
Gorton Works |
On 22/3 the following locomotives were observed renumbered: in the Erecting Shop Nos. 63765, 64302, 65197 an 69326, while outside the Erecting Shop were Nos. 62664 an 64407. Also recently ex works were Nos. E3243 and E9288, which apparently are the last locomotives to leave Gorton Works, bearing the short-lived prefix E. |
SLS/194805 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 902 Built at Gorton Works |
|
|
02/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5902 |
|
|
03/1933 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
12/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northwich (NTH) |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9326 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Wrexham Rhosddu (WRX) |
|
|
23/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69326 |
|
|
14/12/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69326 |
|
|