Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1098 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6882 Week
» 28271 Month
» 147798 Year
» 3174651 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
899 |
m/e |
06/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5899 |
m/e |
02/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9323 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
69323 |
m/e |
01/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
To Service |
During 06/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 26/11/1956 |
Service Life |
57 yrs, 5 mths , 26 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
39B |
Sheffield Darnall |
4w/e |
11/09/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
26/11/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1933 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 899 Built at Gorton Works |
|
|
02/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5899 |
|
|
11/1933 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9323 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Langwith Junction (LNG) |
|
|
01/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69323 |
|
|
21/08/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B) |
|
|
26/11/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69323 |
|
|