Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1731 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7515 Week
» 28904 Month
» 148431 Year
» 3175284 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
898 |
m/e |
06/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5898 |
m/e |
01/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9322 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
69322 |
m/e |
11/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
To Service |
During 06/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 24/06/1959 |
Service Life |
60 yrs , 24 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1934 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 898 Built at Gorton Works |
|
|
01/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5898 |
|
|
12/1934 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
01/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9322 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Immingham (IMM) |
|
|
11/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69322 |
|
|
25/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Louth (40C) |
|
|
20/10/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) |
|
|
16/03/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |
|
|
15/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (34E) |
|
|
24/06/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69322 |
|
|