Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1489 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19292 Week
» 72308 Month
» 191835 Year
» 3218688 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
894 |
m/e |
03/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5894 |
m/e |
07/1927 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9318 |
on |
24/03/1946 |
British Railways |
69318 |
w/e |
25/11/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
To Service |
During 03/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 05/11/1956 |
Service Life |
57 yrs, 8 mths , 7 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1899 |
NEA |
|
Neasden |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
05/11/1956 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
05/11/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1931 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 894 Built at Gorton Works |
|
|
07/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5894 |
|
|
08/1931 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
24/03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9318 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Neasden (NEA) |
|
|
25/11/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69318 |
|
|
05/11/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69318 |
|
|