Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 4254 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17660 Week
» 70676 Month
» 190203 Year
» 3217056 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
206A |
m/e |
04/1898 |
Great Central Railway (Renum) |
189 |
m/e |
08/1900 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5051 |
m/e |
01/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9315 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
69315 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
To Service |
During 04/1898 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 03/06/1958 |
Service Life |
60 yrs, 2 mths , 3 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
04/1898 |
NEA |
|
Neasden |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
36D |
|
Barnsley |
4w/e |
17/11/1956 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
03/06/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
36D |
Barnsley |
3w/e |
01/12/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
03/06/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
01/1926 |
Converted to N5/2 |
11/1930 |
Reverted to Class N5/1 |
03/1933 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1898 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 206 Built at Gorton Works |
|
|
08/1900 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 189 |
|
|
01/1926 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
01/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5051 |
|
|
11/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: Reverted to Class N5/1 |
|
|
03/1933 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9315 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Neasden (NEA) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69315 |
|
|
17/11/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barnsley (36D) |
|
|
03/06/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69315 |
|
|