Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 536 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6320 Week
» 27709 Month
» 147236 Year
» 3174089 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
773 |
m/e |
08/1898 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5773 |
m/e |
03/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9313 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
British Railways |
69313 |
m/e |
03/1952 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Works Number |
3977 |
To Service |
During 08/1898 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 21/03/1955 |
Service Life |
56 yrs, 7 mths , 18 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
02/1934 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1898 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 773 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 3977 |
|
|
03/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5773 |
|
|
02/1934 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
04/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9313 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Neasden (NEA) |
|
|
17/04/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) |
|
|
01/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) |
|
|
03/1952 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69313 |
|
|
21/03/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69313 |
|
|