Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1000 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6784 Week
» 28173 Month
» 147700 Year
» 3174553 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
772 |
m/e |
07/1898 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5772 |
m/e |
01/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9312 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
69312 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Works Number |
3976 |
To Service |
During 07/1898 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 07/10/1957 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 3 mths , 7 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1932 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1898 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 772 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 3976 |
|
|
01/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5772 |
|
|
11/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9312 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
08/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69312 |
|
|
09/04/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
16/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B) |
|
|
23/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B) |
|
|
07/10/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69312 |
|
|