Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 1494 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7278 Week
» 28667 Month
» 148194 Year
» 3175047 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
770 |
m/e |
07/1898 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5770 |
m/e |
02/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9310 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
69310 |
m/e |
01/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Works Number |
3974 |
To Service |
During 07/1898 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 18/11/1955 |
Service Life |
57 yrs, 4 mths , 19 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1898 |
WFD |
|
Woodford Halse |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
38A |
|
Colwick |
4w/e |
19/12/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
18/11/1955 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
38A |
Colwick |
4w/e |
26/12/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
18/11/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
10/1938 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
11/10/1955 |
York |
An unusual visitor to York in October was 73051 (71G) which worked the 4.15 p.m. stopping passenger train from York to Sheffield (Midland) on 11/10/55. (This is normally a Saltley or Bournville Stanier Class 5 turn.) On 19/10/55 ex-works (Darlington) B1s at York shed were 61110 (37A) and 61229 (37C). On 7/11/55 42860 (26B) worked the 10.10 a.m. York to Manchester (Victoria) and 5.10 p.m. Manchester (Victoria) to York instead of the usual York B1. N5 No. 69357 (36B) was in York shed on 9/11/55, and on 15/11/55 A7 No. 69785 (53C) was in the shed yard en route for Darlington works. On 17/11/55 York had quite a Great Central appearance with 69275 (40A) in the shed and 69256 (40F), 69278 (36D), 69303 (36D), and 69310 (38A) in the shed yard, all in steam, and some marked in chalk 'For Darlington plant'. Another most unusual visitor, both as regards type and shed, on the same day was 7F 0-8-0 49648 (25E). |
SLS/195512 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1898 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 770 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 3974 |
|
|
02/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5770 |
|
|
10/1938 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9310 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Woodford Halse (WFD) |
|
|
01/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69310 |
|
|
19/12/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
18/11/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69310 |
|
|