Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 551 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18354 Week
» 71370 Month
» 190897 Year
» 3217750 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
769 |
m/e |
07/1898 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5769 |
m/e |
10/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9309 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
British Railways |
69309 |
m/e |
05/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Works Number |
3973 |
To Service |
During 07/1898 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 23/11/1960 |
Service Life |
62 yrs, 4 mths , 24 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1898 |
IMM |
|
Immingham |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
40C |
|
Louth |
4w/e |
25/07/1953 |
38D |
|
Staveley (G.C.) |
3w/e |
12/11/1955 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
23/11/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
IMM |
Immingham |
w/e |
28/12/1946 |
ALLOC |
40C |
Louth |
4w/e |
11/07/1953 |
ALLOC |
38D |
Staveley (G.C.) |
4w/e |
03/12/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
23/11/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/1932 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1898 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 769 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 3973 |
|
|
10/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5769 |
|
|
07/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
04/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9309 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Immingham (IMM) |
|
|
05/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69309 |
|
|
25/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Louth (40C) |
|
|
12/11/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) |
|
|
23/11/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69309 |
|
|