Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 1045 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18848 Week
» 71864 Month
» 191391 Year
» 3218244 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
768 |
m/e |
05/1898 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5768 |
m/e |
06/1927 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9308 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
69308 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Works Number |
3972 |
To Service |
During 05/1898 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 17/02/1960 |
Service Life |
61 yrs, 9 mths , 18 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1933 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1898 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 768 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 3972 |
|
|
06/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5768 |
|
|
04/1933 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9308 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Gorton (GOR) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69308 |
|
|
30/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northwich (NTH) |
|
|
23/04/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |
|
|
17/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) |
|
|
17/02/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69308 |
|
|