Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 563 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6347 Week
» 27736 Month
» 147263 Year
» 3174116 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
767 |
m/e |
05/1898 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5767 |
m/e |
04/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9307 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
British Railways |
69307 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Works Number |
3971 |
To Service |
During 05/1898 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 10/12/1960 |
Service Life |
62 yrs, 7 mths , 10 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1898 |
GOR |
|
Gorton |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
GOR |
|
Gorton |
m/e |
07/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
10/12/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
EXLOAN |
GOR |
Gorton |
on |
26/06/1949 |
LOAN |
9H |
Gorton |
on |
01/02/1958 |
ALLOC |
9H |
Gorton |
on |
23/02/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
10/12/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1932 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1898 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 767 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 3971 |
|
|
04/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5767 |
|
|
12/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
04/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9307 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Gorton (GOR) |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69307 |
|
|
07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) |
|
|
10/12/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69307 |
|
|