Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 132 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17935 Week
» 70951 Month
» 190478 Year
» 3217331 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
766 |
m/e |
05/1898 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5766 |
m/e |
07/1927 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9306 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
69306 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Works Number |
3970 |
To Service |
During 05/1898 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 08/11/1955 |
Service Life |
57 yrs, 6 mths , 9 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1898 |
LTH |
|
Louth |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
36B |
|
Mexborough |
4w/e |
25/07/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
08/11/1955 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
36B |
Mexborough |
4w/e |
11/07/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
08/11/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1929 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1898 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 766 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 3970 |
|
|
07/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5766 |
|
|
12/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9306 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Louth (LTH) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69306 |
|
|
25/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) |
|
|
08/11/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69306 |
|
|