Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 461 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18264 Week
» 71280 Month
» 190807 Year
» 3217660 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
765 |
m/e |
05/1898 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5765 |
m/e |
05/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9305 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
British Railways |
69305 |
m/e |
09/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Works Number |
3969 |
To Service |
During 05/1898 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 03/08/1958 |
Service Life |
60 yrs, 3 mths , 4 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1898 |
IMM |
|
Immingham |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
36B |
|
Mexborough |
3w/e |
12/11/1955 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
03/08/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
36B |
Mexborough |
4w/e |
03/12/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
05/1930 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1898 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 765 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 3969 |
|
|
05/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5765 |
|
|
05/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
04/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9305 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Immingham (IMM) |
|
|
09/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69305 |
|
|
12/11/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) |
|
|
03/08/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69305 |
|
|