Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 484 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19395 Week
» 84349 Month
» 287013 Year
» 3313866 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway |
755 |
m/e |
01/1896 |
Pre Grouping |
20 |
m/e |
02/1896 |
Great Central Railway |
755 |
m/e |
01/1898 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5755 |
m/e |
02/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9302 |
on |
10/02/1946 |
British Railways |
69302 |
w/e |
04/11/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Works Number |
3814 |
To Service |
During 01/1896 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 08/01/1958 |
Service Life |
62 yrs , 8 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1896 |
NEA |
|
Neasden |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
39B |
|
Sheffield Darnall |
6w/e |
25/12/1954 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
08/01/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
39B |
Sheffield Darnall |
4w/e |
01/01/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
23/12/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1937 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1896 |
To Service |
To service as Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway Number 755 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 3814 |
|
|
02/1896 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20 |
|
|
01/1898 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 755 |
|
|
02/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5755 |
|
|
06/1937 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
10/02/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9302 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Neasden (NEA) |
|
|
04/11/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69302 |
|
|
25/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B) |
|
|
08/01/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69302 |
|
|