Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1355 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7139 Week
» 28528 Month
» 148055 Year
» 3174908 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway |
203A |
m/e |
12/1896 |
Great Central Railway (Renum) |
25 |
m/e |
08/1900 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5025 |
m/e |
05/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9295 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
69295 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
To Service |
During 12/1896 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 12/04/1958 |
Service Life |
61 yrs, 4 mths , 13 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
39B |
Sheffield Darnall |
4w/e |
21/03/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
18/03/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1932 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1896 |
To Service |
To service as Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway Number 203 Built at Gorton Works |
|
|
08/1900 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25 |
|
|
05/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5025 |
|
|
06/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9295 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Staveley (G.C.) (STV) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69295 |
|
|
21/03/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B) |
|
|
12/04/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69295 |
|
|