Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 3150 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16556 Week
» 69572 Month
» 189099 Year
» 3215952 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway |
761 |
m/e |
05/1896 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5761 |
m/e |
01/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9300 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
69300 |
m/e |
02/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
To Service |
During 05/1896 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 03/08/1958 |
Service Life |
62 yrs, 3 mths , 4 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
01/1926 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1896 |
To Service |
To service as Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway Number 761 Built at Gorton Works |
|
|
01/1926 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
01/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5761 |
|
|
12/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) |
|
|
01/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9300 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Neasden (NEA) |
|
|
02/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69300 |
|
|
27/12/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |
|
|
17/01/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |
|
|
17/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barnsley (36D) |
|
|
03/08/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69300 |
|
|