Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 1579 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7363 Week
» 28752 Month
» 148279 Year
» 3175132 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway |
760 |
m/e |
05/1896 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5760 |
m/e |
06/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9299 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
69299 |
m/e |
03/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
To Service |
During 05/1896 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 29/01/1960 |
Service Life |
63 yrs, 8 mths , 30 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
05/1931 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1896 |
To Service |
To service as Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway Number 760 Built at Gorton Works |
|
|
06/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5760 |
|
|
05/1931 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
12/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wrexham Rhosddu (WRX) |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9299 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Gorton (GOR) |
|
|
03/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69299 |
|
|
07/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
10/05/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
19/07/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) |
|
|
29/01/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69299 |
|
|