Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 466 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6250 Week
» 27639 Month
» 147166 Year
» 3174019 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway |
757 |
m/e |
02/1896 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5757 |
m/e |
09/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9297 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
69297 |
m/e |
01/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
To Service |
During 02/1896 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 08/08/1958 |
Service Life |
62 yrs, 6 mths , 8 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
02/1896 |
MEX |
|
Mexborough |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
40B |
|
Immingham |
3w/e |
12/11/1955 |
36D |
|
Barnsley |
4w/e |
25/08/1956 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
08/08/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
40B |
Immingham |
4w/e |
03/12/1955 |
ALLOC |
36D |
Barnsley |
4w/e |
18/08/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
08/08/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
01/1931 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1896 |
To Service |
To service as Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway Number 757 Built at Gorton Works |
|
|
09/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5757 |
|
|
01/1931 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9297 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Mexborough (MEX) |
|
|
01/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69297 |
|
|
12/11/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
25/08/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barnsley (36D) |
|
|
08/08/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69297 |
|
|