Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 88 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17891 Week
» 70907 Month
» 190434 Year
» 3217287 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway |
200A |
m/e |
09/1895 |
Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway (Renum) |
200 |
m/e |
01/1896 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5200 |
m/e |
08/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9292 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
69292 |
m/e |
02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
To Service |
During 09/1895 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 29/01/1960 |
Service Life |
64 yrs, 4 mths , 29 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
39B |
Sheffield Darnall |
4w/e |
21/03/1953 |
ALLOC |
34E |
New England |
4w/e |
27/12/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
29/01/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1930 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1895 |
To Service |
To service as Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway Number 200 Built at Gorton Works |
|
|
01/1896 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 200 |
|
|
08/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5200 |
|
|
12/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9292 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Staveley (G.C.) (STV) |
|
|
02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69292 |
|
|
21/03/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B) |
|
|
13/12/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E) |
|
|
29/01/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69292 |
|
|