|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
19/12/1960 | Doncaster Works (Scrap Road) | New Erecting Shop: E3057-63, D3329, 12125, and frames for three new diesel shunters. Stripping Road: 60113, 60507/10/32, 61083, 61141/51, 73074. Scrap Road: 61771, 62666, 63950/3, 641S2,48875 68943/7, 69293, 69581. Erecting Shop: 43148, 60004/15/25/74/86, 60109, 60539, 61044, 61177, 61314, 61807, 73097, D3475/86, D8020. Erecting Shop Yard: 60058/66, 60144/5, 61266/85, 63923, D3487. Crimpsall Yard: 63944, 68911/4. Paint Shop: 60006, 60531. 61279, 61366, 61862, 62022/56, 63935, D312, D2113, D2207, D5675-7, E3056. | SLS/196102 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1895 | To Service | To service as Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway Number 536 Built at Gorton Works |
||
03/1925 | Modification | Modification: Converted to N5/2 | ||
03/1925 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 5536 | ||
12/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9293 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Northwich (NTH) | ||
03/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 69293 | ||
02/09/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Chester Northgate (6D) | ||
09/09/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Chester Northgate (6D) | ||
10/05/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
29/11/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69293 |